US HR576 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution demands immediate transmittal to the congressional intelligence committees of the whistle-blower complaint received by the Office of the Inspector General of the Intelligence Community on August 12, 2019.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives with respect to the whistleblower complaint of August 12, 2019, made to the Inspector General of the Intelligence Community.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-25 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 548 (Y: 421 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-25 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 421 - 0, 2 Present (Roll no. 548). (text: CR H7921) |
2019-09-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7977-7978) |
2019-09-25 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 576, the Chair put the question on the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Himes demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on until a time to be announced. |
2019-09-25 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 576. |
2019-09-25 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525 and H. Res. 576. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019 |
2019-09-25 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 577. (consideration: CR H7921-7928) |
2019-09-25 | House | Rule H. Res. 577 passed House. |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select). |
2019-09-24 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 577 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525 and H. Res. 576. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2203, H.R. 3525, and H.Res. 576 under closed rules. Rule also provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of September 26, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules; and provides for proceedings during the period from September 30, 2019, through October 14, 2019 |
2019-09-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR577 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR593 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
SR325 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5649; text: CR S5666)
HR593 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select).
SR325 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5649; text: CR S5666)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional committees
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Europe
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Senate Select Committee on Intelligence
Ukraine
Congressional committees
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Europe
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Senate Select Committee on Intelligence
Ukraine