US HR572 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2647) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2010 for military activities of the Department of Defense, to prescribe military personnel strengths for fiscal year 2010.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2647) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2010 for military activities of the Department of Defense, to prescribe military personnel strengths for fiscal year 2010, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-24 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-24 | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 202 (Roll no. 452). (text: CR H7216) | |
2009-06-24 | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 181 (Roll no. 451). (consideration: CR H7234-7235) | |
2009-06-24 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7234-7235) | |
2009-06-24 | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on ordering the previous question for H.Res. 572 and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mario Diaz-Balart (FL) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the previous question on the resolution until later in the legislative day. | |
2009-06-24 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 572. | |
2009-06-24 | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7215-7221) | |
2009-06-23 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 79. | |
2009-06-23 | All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived except those arising under clause 9 or 10 of rule XXI. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment under the five-minute rule the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Armed Services now printed in the bill. In the engrossment of H.R. 2647 the Clerk shall add the text of H.R. 2990, as passed by the House, as new matter at the end of H.R. 2647. H.R. 2990 shall be laid on the table upon its addition to H.R. 2647. | |
2009-06-23 | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 111-182, by Ms. Pingree (ME). |
Same As/Similar To
HB2647 (Related) 2009-10-28 - Became Public Law No: 111-84.
HB2990 (Related) 2009-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB2990 (Related) 2009-08-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.