US HR569 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution expresses solidarity with the Lebanese people following the explosions at the Port of Beirut on August 4, 2020, and supports their right to peacefully demonstrate to achieve political goals and anti-corruption reforms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing continued solidarity with the Lebanese people after the devastating explosions at the Port of Beirut on August 4, 2020, and the continued efforts to form a secure, independent, and democratic Lebanon.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-21HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-10-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-08-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and Global Counterterrorism.
2021-07-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2021-07-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback