US HR566 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Space Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Space Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of the week of October 4, 2017, through October 10, 2017, as World Space Week and for the designation of the week of October 8, 2017, through October 14, 2017, as Earth Science Week. Expresses support for the designation of World Space Week and Earth Science Week. Recognizes the importance of: (1) international cooperation in space missions and outreach and education in advancing our knowledge and discovery of new worlds; and (2) education and public outreach efforts to ensure that the U.S. public gains a better understanding of, and appreciation for, the impact of the earth sciences on their daily lives.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week of October 4, 2017, through October 10, 2017, as World Space Week and for the designation of the week of October 8, 2017, through October 14, 2017, as Earth Science Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Space. |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-10-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1120 (Same As) 2018-10-05 - Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/566/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres566/BILLS-115hres566ih.pdf |