US HR565 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-17)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Clean Energy Week.
Title
Supporting the designation of the week of September 23 through September 27, 2019, as "National Clean Energy Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-09-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR348 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754)
HR1130 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR705 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5712)
HR1130 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR705 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5715-5716; text: CR S5712)
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Energy
Small business
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Energy
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/565/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres565/BILLS-116hres565ih.pdf |