US HR555 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-23 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 93.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-23 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 93.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of the Interior to transmit, respectively, certain documents and other information to the House of Representatives relating to the executive order on the review of designations under the Antiquities Act. Requests the President and directs the Department of the Interior to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of all documents and communications that refer or relate to Executive Order 13792, dated April 26, 2017, which requires Interior to review designations or expansions of certain national monuments under the Antiquities Act since 1996.
Title
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of the Interior to transmit, respectively, certain documents and other information to the House of Representatives relating to the executive order on the review of designations under the Antiquities Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Ruben Kihuen [D-NV] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 93. |
2017-10-23 | House | Reported adversely (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-364. |
2017-10-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 17. |
2017-10-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-10-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-10-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional-executive branch relations
Department of the Interior
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Historic sites and heritage areas
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Department of the Interior
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Historic sites and heritage areas
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources