US HR552 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the importance of independent living for individuals with disabilities made possible by the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 and calling for further action to strengthen home and community living for individuals with disabilities.
Title
Recognizing the importance of independent living for individuals with disabilities made possible by the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 and calling for further action to strengthen home and community living for individuals with disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR348 (Related) 2021-08-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6106; text: CR S6114-6115)
SR714 (Related) 2022-07-20 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3547-3548)
HR1270 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SR714 (Related) 2022-07-20 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3547-3548)
HR1270 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/552/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres552/BILLS-117hres552ih.pdf |