US HR546 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Introduced on August 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution calls on all leaders of the Group of Seven (a group consisting of the seven largest major advanced economies, as determined by the International Monetary Fund) to oppose Russia's readmission into the group. The resolution also condemns Russia's assaults on democratic societies worldwide and its aggressive actions in Ukraine. (Russia was disinvited from the Group of Eight in 2014 after it occupied parts of Ukraine, including the Crimea region.)
Title
Disapproving the Russian Federation's inclusion in future Group of Seven summits until it respects the territorial integrity of its neighbors and adheres to the standards of democratic societies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-03 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution RC# 643 (Y: 339 N: 71 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 339 - 71 (Roll no. 643). (text: CR H9197) |
2019-12-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9208-9209) |
2019-12-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 546. |
2019-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9197-9198) |
2019-12-03 | House | Mr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment. |
2019-08-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-08-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
Canada
Conflicts and wars
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
France
Germany
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Italy
Japan
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Ukraine
United Kingdom
Canada
Conflicts and wars
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
France
Germany
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Italy
Japan
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Ukraine
United Kingdom