US HR542 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Kinship Care Month and encourages Congress to work to improve the lives of vulnerable children and families.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 2019 as "National Kinship Care Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support. |
2019-08-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-08-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR323 (Related) 2019-09-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5633; text: CR S5631-5632)
HR1101 (Same As) 2020-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR736 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5985)
HR1101 (Same As) 2020-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SR736 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5998; text: CR S5985)
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Family relationships
Family services
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Families
Family relationships
Family services
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/542/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres542/BILLS-116hres542ih.pdf |