US HR538 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-11)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the historical, cultural, and religious significance of Sikh Americans, and for other purposes. This resolution recognizes the contributions and sacrifices made by Sikh Americans and expresses respect for all Sikhs who practice their faith. The resolution also recognizes the historical, cultural, and religious significance of Guru Nanak's 550th birthday. Additionally, the resolution recognizes the discrimination Sikh Americans have faced.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the historical, cultural, and religious significance of Sikh Americans, and for other purposes.

Sponsors

Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-08-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR393 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6339)
HR680 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR689 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback