US HR538 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-12)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the contributions and sacrifices made by Sikh Americans and expresses respect for all Sikhs who practice their faith. The resolution also recognizes the historical, cultural, and religious significance of Guru Nanak's 550th birthday. Additionally, the resolution recognizes the discrimination Sikh Americans have faced.
Title
Recognizing the historical, cultural, and religious significance of Sikh Americans, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-08-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR393 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/31/2019 S6339)
HR680 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR689 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR427 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6612-6613)
HR680 (Related) 2019-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR689 (Related) 2019-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR427 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6612-6613)
Subjects
Asia
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/538/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres538/BILLS-116hres538ih.pdf |