US HR527 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of the week of September 18, 2017, through September 24, 2017, as "Balance Awareness Week". Expresses support for the designation of Balance Awareness Week and recognizes the importance of raising public awareness about vestibular (inner ear balance) disorders.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week of September 18, 2017, through September 24, 2017, as "Balance Awareness Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-09-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1061 (Same As) 2018-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/527/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres527/BILLS-115hres527ih.pdf |