US HR524 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3564) to cancel recent changes made by the Federal Housing Finance Agency to the up-front loan level pricing adjustments charged by Fannie Mae and Freddie Mac for guarantee of single-family mortgages, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3799) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for health reimbursement arrangements integrated with individual health insurance coverage; and providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 461) condemning the use of elementary and secondary school facilities to provide shelter for aliens who are not admitted to the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3564) to cancel recent changes made by the Federal Housing Finance Agency to the up-front loan level pricing adjustments charged by Fannie Mae and Freddie Mac for guarantee of single-family mortgages, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 3799) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for health reimbursement arrangements integrated with individual health insurance coverage; and providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 461) condemning the use of elementary and secondary school facilities to provide shelter for aliens who are not admitted to the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-21 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution RC# 275 (Y: 215 N: 211 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question RC# 274 (Y: 215 N: 207 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2023-06-21HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 215 - 211 (Roll no. 275). (text: CR H3003)
2023-06-21HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 207 (Roll no. 274).
2023-06-21HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3011-3013)
2023-06-21HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 524, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
2023-06-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 524.
2023-06-21HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H3003-3011)
2023-06-20HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 26.
2023-06-20HouseThe resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3564 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate; H.R. 3799 under a structured rule with eighty minutes of general debate; and H.Res. 461, under a closed rule with one hour of general debate. The resolution provides for a motion to recommit on H.R. 3564 and H.R. 3799.
2023-06-20HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 118-115, by Mr. Burgess.
2023-06-20HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3564 (Related) 2023-07-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3799 (Related) 2023-06-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR461 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback