US HR517 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 129-31)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the Global Fund to fight AIDS, tuberculosis (TB), malaria, and its Sixth Replenishment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the Global Fund to fight AIDS, tuberculosis (TB), malaria, and its Sixth Replenishment.

Sponsors

Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]
Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]
Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-03HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-12-03HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9192)
2019-12-03HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 517.
2019-12-03HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9192-9194)
2019-12-03HouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
2019-09-25HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-09-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-07-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR318 (Related) 2019-12-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6790-6791; text: 12/10/2019 CR S6955)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback