US HR490 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirming the importance of the United States to promote the safety, health, and well-being of refugees and displaced persons.
Title
Reaffirming the importance of the United States to promote the safety, health, and well-being of refugees and displaced persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR283 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S4730-4731)
HR1195 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SR684 (Related) 2022-06-21 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S3033)
HR1195 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SR684 (Related) 2022-06-21 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S3033)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/490/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres490/BILLS-117hres490ih.pdf |