US HR472 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of June 12, 2021, as ''Women Veterans Appreciation Day''.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of June 12, 2021, as ''Women Veterans Appreciation Day''.
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-06-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR267 (Related) 2021-10-19 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7078-7079)
SR668 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/9/2022 CR S2896-2897)
SR668 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/9/2022 CR S2896-2897)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/472/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres472/BILLS-117hres472ih.pdf |