US HR444 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-3)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reaffirming the importance of the United States to promote the safety, health, and well-being of refugees and displaced persons. This resolution reaffirms the bipartisan commitment to promoting the safety, health, education, and well-being of refugees and persons displaced by war, persecution and violence. It also calls upon the Department of State and the Ambassador to the United Nations to continue supporting robust funding for refugee protection and humanitarian response overseas and resettlement in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reaffirming the importance of the United States to promote the safety, health, and well-being of refugees and displaced persons.

Sponsors

Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]
Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7886-7887)
2019-09-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 444.
2019-09-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7886-7888)
2019-09-24HouseMr. Levin (MI) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
2019-06-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-06-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-06-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-14HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback