US HR444 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-3)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution reaffirms the bipartisan commitment to promoting the safety, health, education, and well-being of refugees and persons displaced by war, persecution and violence. It also calls upon the Department of State and the Ambassador to the United Nations to continue supporting robust funding for refugee protection and humanitarian response overseas and resettlement in the United States.
Title
Reaffirming the importance of the United States to promote the safety, health, and well-being of refugees and displaced persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7886-7887) |
2019-09-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 444. |
2019-09-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7886-7888) |
2019-09-24 | House | Mr. Levin (MI) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sex offenses
United Nations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Conflicts and wars
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Sex offenses
United Nations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity