US HR437 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry requesting the President to provide certain documents in the President's possession. Requests the President to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of any documents or communications in the possession of the General Services Administration (GSA) that refer or relate to: guidance or direction to the Acting Administrator or other staff of the GSA regarding responses to requests for information from Members of Congress, the lease agreement between the Trump Old Post Office LLC and the federal government (Ground Lease No. GS-LS-11-11307) or legal memoranda or opinions generated by the government related to such lease.
Title
Of inquiry requesting the President to provide certain documents in the President's possession.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 73. |
2017-07-28 | House | Reported adversely by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-269. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported Unfavorably by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 24. |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2017-07-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-07-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Business records
Congress
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Federal officials
Financial services and investments
General Services Administration
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Lease and rental services
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Congress
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Federal officials
Financial services and investments
General Services Administration
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Lease and rental services
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents