US HR436 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of July 29, 2017, as "Paralympic and Adaptive Sport Day". Express support for: (1) the designation of Paralympic and Adaptive Sport Day, and (2) the inclusive goals of the Paralympic Movement. Recognizes: (1) the value of sport for athletes with a disability, and (2) the contribution and sacrifice of members of the Armed Forces who have sustained a traumatic injury and acquired a disability in the service of the United States. Promotes a more inclusive society for all people with a disability through paralympic and adaptive sport.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of July 29, 2017, as "Paralympic and Adaptive Sport Day".
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR247 (Related) 2017-08-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4882, S4894; text: CR S4882)
Subjects
Athletes
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Military personnel and dependents
Olympic games
Sports and recreation
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Military personnel and dependents
Olympic games
Sports and recreation
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/436/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres436/BILLS-115hres436ih.pdf |