US HR430 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-16 - COMMUNICATION TO THE HOUSE - The House received a communication from Jerrold Nadler, Chairman of the Committee on the Judiciary. Chairman Nadler notified the House of the initiation by the Committee on the Judiciary of the following judicial proceedings pursuant to H. Res. 430: 1. In Re: Application of the Committee on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives, for an Order Authorizing the Release of Certain Grand Jury Materials, Misc. no. 1:19-gj-00048-BAH filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia on July 26, 2019. 2. Committee on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives v. McGahn, No. 1:19-cv-2379 filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia on August 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Committee on the Judiciary to initiate or intervene in judicial proceedings to enforce certain subpoenas and for other purposes. This resolution authorizes the House Committee on the Judiciary to initiate or intervene in federal judicial proceedings to enforce compliance with certain subpoenas issued to Attorney General William Barr and former White House Counsel Donald McGahn. Additionally, the resolution provides explicit authority for each congressional committee, if authorized by the Bipartisan Legal Advisory Group, to initiate or intervene in federal judicial proceedings to enforce compliance with congressional subpoenas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Committee on the Judiciary to initiate or intervene in judicial proceedings to enforce certain subpoenas and for other purposes.

Sponsors

Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]

Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 247 (Y: 229 N: 191 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-16HouseCOMMUNICATION TO THE HOUSE - The House received a communication from Jerrold Nadler, Chairman of the Committee on the Judiciary. Chairman Nadler notified the House of the initiation by the Committee on the Judiciary of the following judicial proceedings pursuant to H. Res. 430: 1. In Re: Application of the Committee on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives, for an Order Authorizing the Release of Certain Grand Jury Materials, Misc. no. 1:19-gj-00048-BAH filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia on July 26, 2019. 2. Committee on the Judiciary, U.S. House of Representatives v. McGahn, No. 1:19-cv-2379 filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia on August 7, 2019.
2019-06-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-11HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 191 (Roll no. 247). (text: CR H4411)
2019-06-11HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-06-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 430.
2019-06-11HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2740 and H. Res. 430. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 2740, under a structured rule. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.Res. 430, under a closed rule.
2019-06-11HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 431. (consideration: CR H4411-4423)
2019-06-11HouseRule H. Res. 431 passed House.
2019-06-10HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 27.
2019-06-10HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Rules. H. Rept. 116-108.
2019-06-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Rules.
2019-06-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR431 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback