US HR428 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-18)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Costello (PA) asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.Res. 428, a bill originally introduced by Representative Murphy (PA), for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Costello (PA) asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.Res. 428, a bill originally introduced by Representative Murphy (PA), for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of "National Eating Disorders Awareness Week" and supporting the goals and ideals to raise awareness and understanding of eating disorders. Recognizes National Eating Disorders Awareness Week. Recognizes the rate at which individuals are affected by eating disorders and the inadequate rate at which such individuals seek treatment. Acknowledges that eating disorders can be successfully treated and that individuals with eating disorders can and do recover.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of "National Eating Disorders Awareness Week" and supporting the goals and ideals to raise awareness and understanding of eating disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | House | ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Costello (PA) asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.Res. 428, a bill originally introduced by Representative Murphy (PA), for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR419 (Related) 2018-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration CR S1321; text: CR S1317-1318)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Nutrition and diet
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Nutrition and diet
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/428/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres428/BILLS-115hres428ih.pdf |