US HR418 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the Secretary of the Interior to recognize the cultural significance of Rib Mountain by adding it to the National Register of Historic Places. Requests the Department of the Interior to recognize the legendary burial site of Paul Bunyan by adding Rib Mountain to the National Register of Historic Places.
Title
Urging the Secretary of the Interior to recognize the cultural significance of Rib Mountain by adding it to the National Register of Historic Places.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H8861) |
2018-09-25 | House | H.Amdt.966 On agreeing to the McClintock amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | H.Amdt.966 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. McClintock. (consideration: CR H8861; text: CR H8861) |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8861) |
2018-09-25 | House | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. McClintock asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-09-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-05 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-06-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-06-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR206 (Same As) 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3834)
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Public lands and natural resources
Wisconsin
Historical and cultural resources
Public lands and natural resources
Wisconsin