US HR413 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-12)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E729-730)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the immense gratitude of the House of Representatives for the acts of heroism, valor, and sacrifices made by the members of the United States Armed Forces and allied armed forces who participated in the June 6, 1944, amphibious landing at Normandy, France, and commending those individuals for their leadership and bravery in an operation that helped bring an end to World War II. This resolution recognizes the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing of the allied forces on D-Day, June 6, 1944, at Normandy, France, during World War II. The resolution expresses appreciation to the members of the U.S. and allied forces who participated in the operations, as well as all others who contributed to the success of the operations; recognizes the landing as a decisive point in history that led to world leadership and a free people committed to modern liberal democracy and all its tenets; recognizes the importance of World War II history and D-Day as symbols of the costs of freedom, the perils of fascism, and the nature of U.S. global alliances and partnerships; thanks the young people of the allies for their involvement in events celebrating the anniversary of the Normandy landings; calls for expanding educational efforts about the lessons of World War II; recognizes the efforts of France and the people of Normandy to preserve the world heritage represented by the Normandy beaches and the sunken material remains of the landings by inscribing these on the UNESCO World Heritage List; requests the President to issue a proclamation recognizing the living veterans of the campaign; and calls on the people of the United States to observe the 75th anniversary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing the immense gratitude of the House of Representatives for the acts of heroism, valor, and sacrifices made by the members of the United States Armed Forces and allied armed forces who participated in the June 6, 1944, amphibious landing at Normandy, France, and commending those individuals for their leadership and bravery in an operation that helped bring an end to World War II.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E729-730)
2019-06-04HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-04HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H4295-4296)
2019-06-04HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4295-4296)
2019-06-04HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
2019-06-04HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
2019-06-04HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
2019-06-04HouseMr. Keating asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2019-05-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-05-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-30HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback