US HR41 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 24) impeaching Donald John Trump, President of the United States, for high crimes and misdemeanors.
Title
Providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 24) impeaching Donald John Trump, President of the United States, for high crimes and misdemeanors.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-13 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 221 N: 203 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 221 N: 205 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 221 N: 205 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-01-13 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 203 (Roll no. 16). (text: CR H151-152) |
2021-01-13 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 205 (Roll no. 15). |
2021-01-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 41. |
2021-01-13 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H151-165) |
2021-01-12 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 2. |
2021-01-12 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H. Res. 24 with 2 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2021-01-12 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-2, by Mr. McGovern. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR24 (Related) 2021-02-13 - The Senate adjudges that Donald John Trump, former President of the United States, is not guilty as charged in the Article of Impeachment by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 43. Record Vote Number: 59.
HR41 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR40 (Related) 2021-01-25 - Received in the Senate.
HR41 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR40 (Related) 2021-01-25 - Received in the Senate.