US HR40 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appointing and authorizing managers for the impeachment trial of Donald John Trump, President of the United States.
Title
Appointing and authorizing managers for the impeachment trial of Donald John Trump, President of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2021-01-13 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 41, H. Res. 40 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H192; text: CR H192) |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR24 (Related) 2021-02-13 - The Senate adjudges that Donald John Trump, former President of the United States, is not guilty as charged in the Article of Impeachment by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 43. Record Vote Number: 59.
HR41 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR41 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.