US HR391 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Gun Violence Awareness Month and National Gun Violence Awareness Weekend.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Gun Violence Awareness Weekend and National Gun Violence Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR217 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3011)
HR977 (Related) 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SR592 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2556)
HR977 (Related) 2020-05-22 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SR592 (Related) 2020-05-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S2556)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Firearms and explosives
Violent crime
Community life and organization
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Firearms and explosives
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/391/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres391/BILLS-116hres391ih.pdf |