US HR365 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of May 2021 as "Mental Health Awareness Month".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of May 2021 as "Mental Health Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR254 (Related) 2021-06-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 5/27/2021 CR S3905-3906)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/365/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres365/BILLS-117hres365ih.pdf |