US HR354 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-03 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 585). (text: CR 11/2/2015 H7372-7373)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-03 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 585). (text: CR 11/2/2015 H7372-7373)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the safety and security of Jewish communities in Europe. Urges the U.S. government to work with European governments and European law enforcement agencies encouraging them to: partner with, share information, and train Jewish community groups to strengthen preparedness and response to anti-Semitic attacks and to support related research initiatives; consider formal partnerships in the United States, United Kingdom, and France between government entities and Jewish community security groups as examples of such partnering; support assessments of the environments of hate crimes and anti-Semitism, including analysis of crimes and law enforcement and community response, and cooperation between European governments and intergovernmental and inter-organizational entities, and use these assessments to adjust efforts to combat anti-Semitism; help Jewish communities develop safety standards; consider developing a standardized pan-European information-sharing and alerting system among governments, inter-governmental agencies, and Jewish communities; work for the implementation of Organization for Security and Cooperation in Europe declarations and decisions, particularly those focusing on anti-Semitism; ensure that law enforcement personnel are trained to monitor, prevent, and respond to anti-Semitic violence, and that senior officials with commensurate authority and resources have been appointed to combat anti-Semitism; integrate efforts to combat violent extremism and efforts to combat anti-Semitism; and work with law enforcement associations and other relevant professional entities to combat anti-Semitism and to actualize the goals of this resolution. Supports the mandate of the United States Special Envoy to Monitor and Combat Anti-Semitism as part of the broader policy priority of fostering international religious freedom. Urges the Department of State to continue U.S. reporting on anti-Semitism by the Department and the Special Envoy to Combat and Monitor Anti-Semitism.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the safety and security of Jewish communities in Europe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree, as Amended (Y: 418 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 0 (Roll no. 585). (text: CR 11/2/2015 H7372-7373) |
2015-11-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7412) |
2015-11-02 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-11-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 354. |
2015-11-02 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7372-7378) |
2015-11-02 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2015-10-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-10-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-07 | House | Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations Discharged. |
2015-10-07 | House | Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats Discharged. |
2015-08-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats. |
2015-08-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2015-07-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-07-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
European Union
Hate crimes
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Political movements and philosophies
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Terrorism
Violent crime
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
European Union
Hate crimes
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Political movements and philosophies
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Terrorism
Violent crime