US HR345 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of the month of June 2015 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month" and June 27, 2015, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day". Supports: the designation of National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month and National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day; and efforts of the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Defense, as well as the medical community, to educate members of the Armed Forces, veterans, their families, and the public about the causes, symptoms, and treatment of post-traumatic stress (PTS) injuries. Encourages Armed Forces commanders to support appropriate treatment of personnel diagnosed with PTS.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the month of June 2015 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Month" and June 27, 2015, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2015-07-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR215 (Related) 2015-06-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4657; text as passed Senate: CR S4654)
SR512 (Related) 2016-06-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4553-4554, S4562; text of measure as introduced: CR S4553-4554)
SR512 (Related) 2016-06-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4553-4554, S4562; text of measure as introduced: CR S4553-4554)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Commemorative events and holidays
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/345/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres345/BILLS-114hres345ih.pdf |