US HR336 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Calling on the Government of the Russian Federation to provide evidence or to release United States citizen Paul Whelan.
Title
Calling on the Government of the Russian Federation to provide evidence or to release United States citizen Paul Whelan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4523) |
2022-04-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 336. |
2022-04-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4523-4525) |
2022-04-27 | House | Mr. Phillips moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2021-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-04-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR165 (Same As) 2021-07-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5056-5057; text: CR S5057)