US HR336 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-13)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirming a strong commitment to the United States-Mexico partnership. Reaffirms a strong commitment to a U.S.-Mexico partnership based on mutual respect and the promotion of shared democratic values. Supports: (1) continued bilateral cooperation through the High Level Economic Dialogue on issues related to the economic well-being and security of both countries; (2) continued engagement with Mexico to tackle regional issues and work together in international fora; and (3) efforts by the Mexican government to strengthen the rule of law, reduce corruption, and advance civil and human rights. Encourages continued security cooperation between the United States and Mexican law enforcement agencies and militaries.
Title
Reaffirming a strong commitment to the United States-Mexico partnership.
Sponsors
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Keith Rothfus [R-PA] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9824) |
2017-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 336. |
2017-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9824-9826) |
2017-12-12 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-24 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2017-05-24 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mexico
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Rule of law and government transparency
Terrorism
Violent crime
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mexico
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Rule of law and government transparency
Terrorism
Violent crime