US HR333 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for (1) the goals and values of the 51st anniversary of the enactment of the Fair Housing Act and the 30th anniversary of the enactment of the Fair Housing Amendments Act of 1988, and (2) activities to celebrate the historical milestones represented by such anniversaries.
Title
Promoting and supporting the goals and ideals of the Fair Housing Act and supporting the recognition of April 2019 as Fair Housing Month, which includes bringing attention to the discrimination faced by everyday Americans in the United States in housing and housing-related transactions on the basis of race, color, national origin, sex, familial status, disability, and religion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-05-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3399-3401) |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR946 (Related) 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/333/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres333/BILLS-116hres333ih.pdf |