US HR329 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the celebration of the month of June as LGBTQ Pride Month. Recognizes that all Americans should be treated fairly and equally regardless of sexual orientation or gender identity. Acknowledges the struggle of the Stonewall protestors (human rights protesters at the Stonewall Inn in New York City on June 28, 1969) and other lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and queer (LGBTQ) people for equality. Encourages the celebration of LGBTQ Pride Month to provide an opportunity for people in the United States to learn about discrimination and inequality that continues to face LGBTQ people. Recognizes that the United States must continue to strive to ensure that the promise of equality is realized for all Americans.
Title
Encouraging the celebration of the month of June as LGBTQ Pride Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] |
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-06-24 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4643-4645) |
2015-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR772 (Related) 2016-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Commemorative events and holidays
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/329/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres329/BILLS-114hres329ih.pdf |