US HR326 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 193-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 47.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding United States efforts to resolve the Israeli-Palestinian conflict through a negotiated two-state solution. This resolution expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that only a two-state solution to the Israeli-Palestinian conflict can ensure Israel's survival as a secure Jewish and democratic state and fulfill the legitimate aspirations for a Palestinian state. It also expresses the sense that any U.S. proposal to achieve a just, stable, and lasting solution should expressly endorse a two-state solution and discourage steps that would put a peaceful resolution further out of reach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding United States efforts to resolve the Israeli-Palestinian conflict through a negotiated two-state solution.

Sponsors

Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]
Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 47.
2019-10-17HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 116-242.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and International Terrorism.
2019-04-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR518 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback