US HR317 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-13)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution states that the Chinese government is responsible for ongoing abuses against the Uyghurs and other ethnic and religious minority groups and that these abuses constitute genocide and crimes against humanity. The resolution also condemns such genocide and crimes against humanity and calls on the President to take certain actions to put an end to these atrocities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning the ongoing genocide and crimes against humanity being committed against Uyghurs and members of other religious and ethnic minority groups by the People's Republic of China. Condemning the ongoing genocide and crimes against humanity being committed against Uyghurs and members of other religious and ethnic minority groups by the People’s Republic of China.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended (Y: 427 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-12-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 427 - 1 (Roll no. 414). (text: CR H7507)
2021-12-08HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7534-7535)
2021-12-08HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-12-08HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 317.
2021-12-08HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7507-7509)
2021-12-08HouseMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
2021-04-21HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-04-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2021-04-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3524 (Related) 2021-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 22.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback