US HR317 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-1)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes that (1) Black Maternal Health Week is an opportunity to raise national awareness of the state of black maternal health in the United States; and (2) black women experience high, disproportionate rates of maternal mortality and morbidity.
Title
Supporting the designation of the week of April 11 through April 17, 2019 as "Black Maternal Health Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR154 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2390)
HR926 (Related) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HR926 (Related) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Disability and health-based discrimination
Economic development
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Housing supply and affordability
Human rights
Minority health
Nutrition and diet
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex and reproductive health
Violent crime
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Women's health
Community life and organization
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Disability and health-based discrimination
Economic development
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Housing supply and affordability
Human rights
Minority health
Nutrition and diet
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex and reproductive health
Violent crime
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/317/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres317/BILLS-116hres317ih.pdf |