US HR304 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 92-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution recognizes the opportunity for Black Maternal Health Week to raise national awareness of the state of Black maternal health in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the designation of the week of April 11 through April 17, 2021, as "Black Maternal Health Week" to bring national attention to the maternal health crisis in the United States and the importance of reducing maternal mortality and morbidity among Black women and birthing persons.

Sponsors

Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
2021-04-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR153 (Related) 2021-04-13 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1900)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback