US HR298 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Appreciation Week. Specialized instructional support personnel include school counselors, school nurses, mental health personnel, social workers, therapists, and speech pathologists and audiologists serving the nation's schools and sturdents.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 8, 2019, through April 12, 2019, as National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Appreciation Week.
Sponsors
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR181 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2577; text: CR S2575-2576)
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Mental health
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Mental health
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/298/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres298/BILLS-116hres298ih.pdf |