US HR291 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 5 through April 9, 2021, as National Assistant Principals Week.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 5 through April 9, 2021, as National Assistant Principals Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1029 (Same As) 2022-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR586 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2097)
SR586 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2097)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/291/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres291/BILLS-117hres291ih.pdf |