US HR274 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights. Condemns the government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights. Urges the President and the Department of State to: (1) condemn the Iranian government's continued violation of human rights and demand the immediate release of prisoners held solely on account of their religion, and (2) impose sanctions on Iranian officials and other individuals directly responsible for serious human rights abuses.
Title
Condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-12 | House | H.Amdt.986 On agreeing to the Ros-Lehtinen amendment (A002) Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-12 | House | H.Amdt.986 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Ros-Lehtinen. (consideration: CR H10139-10140; text: CR H10139-10140) |
2018-12-12 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10138-10139) |
2018-12-12 | House | H.Amdt.985 On agreeing to the Ros-Lehtinen amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-12 | House | H.Amdt.985 Amendment (A001) offered by Ms. Ros-Lehtinen. (consideration: CR H10139; text: CR H10139) |
2018-12-12 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10138-10140) |
2018-12-12 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-12-12 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2017-06-29 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2017-06-29 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR139 (Same As) 2017-12-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8276-8277; text: CR S8277)