US HR270 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Public Health Week. Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Public Health Week. Recognizes the efforts of public health professionals, governments, tribes, and individuals in preventing disease and injury. Encourages increased efforts and resources to improve the health of individuals in the United States to create the healthiest nation in one generation through greater opportunities to improve community health and by strengthening the public health system.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Public Health Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR125 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2458)
HR805 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR462 (Related) 2018-04-12 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2127)
HR805 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR462 (Related) 2018-04-12 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2127)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/270/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres270/BILLS-115hres270ih.pdf |