US HR268 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 216-140-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirms support for a negotiated solution to the Israeli-Palestinian conflict resulting in two states, a democratic Jewish state of Israel and a democratic Palestinian state living in peace and mutual recognition. States that any Palestinian unity government must forswear terrorism, accept Israel's right to exist, and reaffirm previous agreements made with Israel. Opposes any attempt to establish or seek recognition of a Palestinian state outside of an agreement negotiated between Israel and the Palestinians. Urges Palestinian leaders to: (1) cease efforts at circumventing the negotiation process, including through a unilateral declaration of statehood or by seeking recognition of a Palestinian state from other nations or the United Nations (U.N.); and (2) resume direct negotiations with Israel. Supports the Administration's opposition to a unilateral declaration of a Palestinian state. Calls upon the Administration to lead a diplomatic effort to oppose a unilateral declaration of a Palestinian state and to oppose recognition of a Palestinian state by other nations within the U.N. and in other international forums prior to a final agreement between Israel and the Palestinians. Affirms that Palestinian efforts to circumvent direct negotiations will harm U.S.-Palestinian relations and will have implications for U.S. assistance programs for the Palestinians and the Palestinians Authority (PA). Reaffirms the U.S. statutory requirement precluding assistance to a PA that includes Hamas unless that PA and all its ministers accept Israel's right to exist and all prior agreements and understandings with the United States and Israel.
Title
Reaffirming the United States' commitment to a negotiated settlement of the Israeli-Palestinian conflict through direct Israeli-Palestinian negotiations, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-07 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree (Y: 407 N: 6 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-07-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 6, 13 Present (Roll no. 524). (text: CR 7/6/2011 H4625-4626) |
2011-07-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4732-4733) |
2011-07-06 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-07-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 268. |
2011-07-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4625-4632) |
2011-07-06 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2011-05-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SR185 (Related) 2011-06-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4163)
Subjects
Arab-Israeli relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International law and treaties
Israel
Middle East
Palestinians
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
United Nations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International law and treaties
Israel
Middle East
Palestinians
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
United Nations