US HR257 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-25)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Condemning hate crime and any other form of racism, religious or ethnic bias, discrimination, incitement to violence, or animus targeting a minority in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning hate crime and any other form of racism, religious or ethnic bias, discrimination, incitement to violence, or animus targeting a minority in the United States.

Sponsors

Rep. Barbara Comstock [R]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D]Rep. Scott Taylor [R]Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]
Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D]Rep. Mike Quigley [D]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D]
Rep. Gwen Moore [D]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D]Rep. Ro Khanna [D]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D]Rep. William Keating [D]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D]Rep. Keith Ellison [D]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D]Rep. Pete Olson [R]Rep. Ami Bera [D]Rep. Don Beyer [D]
Rep. John Rutherford [R]Rep. Charles Dent [R]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D]Rep. Judy Chu [D]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D]Rep. Thomas Garrett [R]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D]
Rep. Brian Mast [R]Rep. Robert Scott [D]Rep. Robert Brady [D]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D]
Rep. Dave Brat [R]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D]Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D]Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R]Rep. John Katko [R]
Rep. John Faso [R]Rep. Chris Collins [R]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R]Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]
Rep. Mike Bishop [R]Rep. Kevin Yoder [R]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D]Rep. Frank Pallone [D]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D]Rep. Jared Polis [D]Rep. Luis Correa [D]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D]
Rep. Andre Carson [D]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D]Rep. Bill Foster [D]
Rep. Charlie Crist [D]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D]Rep. Gene Green [D]Rep. John Delaney [D]
Rep. John Culberson [R]Rep. Rodney Davis [R]Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R]Rep. Roger Marshall [R]
Rep. David Valadao [R]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D]Rep. Robert Wittman [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-25HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H7200-7201)
2018-07-25HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7200-7201)
2018-07-25HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
2018-07-25HouseMrs. Handel asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2017-04-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2017-04-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2017-04-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR118 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2371-2372; text: CR S2371)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback