US HR256 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing support for the countries of Eastern Europe and the North Atlantic Treaty Organization. Condemns: (1) any threat to the sovereignty, territorial integrity, freedom, and democracy of the Baltic States; and (2) the ongoing violation of the Helsinki principles by the Russian Federation with respect to the sovereignty and territorial integrity of Ukraine. Supports: (1) keeping in effect U.S. sanctions imposed against Russia relating to Crimea until Ukraine's sovereignty over Crimea has been restored and sanctions relating to the Donbas until the Minsk agreements are fully implemented; (2) keeping the door to North Atlantic Treaty Organization membership open to those countries that are eligible to join the alliance and that meet all the necessary requirements for membership; and (3) the democratic aspirations of the people of all countries concerned, including Ukraine, Georgia, and Moldova. Declares that the House of Representatives: (1) considers it to be essential for the United States to maintain and increase political, economic, and security support for the countries of Central and Eastern Europe; and (2) appreciates the spirit of friendship of such countries, their commitment to collective security, and their contributions to peace operations around the globe. Calls for continued support to the United States European Reassurance Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the countries of Eastern Europe and the North Atlantic Treaty Organization.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-11HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-11HouseH.Amdt.843 On agreeing to the Royce (CA) amendment (A002) Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-11HouseH.Amdt.843 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Royce (CA). (consideration: CR H6067; text: CR H6067)
2018-07-11HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-11HouseH.Amdt.842 On agreeing to the Royce (CA) amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-11HouseH.Amdt.842 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Royce (CA). (consideration: CR H6066-6067; text: CR H6066-6067)
2018-07-11HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6065-6067; text of measure as reported in House: CR H6066)
2018-07-11HouseMr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2018-07-11HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
2018-06-28HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
2018-06-28HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-06-28HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-05-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
2017-04-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2017-04-06HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E471)
2017-04-06HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback