US HR251 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of the weeks of April 9, 2017, through April 22, 2017, as National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Weeks. Expresses support for the designation of National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Weeks. (Young Audiences Arts for Learning is a nonprofit organization that presents arts-in-education programs to students and teachers.) Honors the contributions that Young Audiences Arts for Learning programs have made in enriching the lives of students, teachers, volunteers, families, and communities.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the weeks of April 9, 2017, through April 22, 2017, as National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Weeks.
Sponsors
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR803 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Performing arts
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Performing arts
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/251/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres251/BILLS-115hres251ih.pdf |