US HR246 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring the vital role of small business and the passion of entrepreneurs in the United States during "National Small Business Week", beginning on May 4, through May 8, 2015. Supports: (1) the designation of National Small Business Week, (2) efforts to encourage consumers to shop locally, and (3) efforts to increase awareness of the value of locally owned small businesses and the impact of locally owned small business on the U.S. economy. Honors the vital role of small business and entrepreneurs in the United States during such week. Recognizes: (1) the important role of the Small Business Administration as a valuable resource for the U.S. entrepreneur, (2) the importance of creating policies that promote a business friendly environment for small business owners free of unnecessary regulations, and (3) the National Small Business Person of the Year and the National Lender of the Year. Encourages young entrepreneurs to pursue their passions and create more start-up businesses.
Title
Honoring the vital role of small business and the passion of entrepreneurs in the United States during "National Small Business Week", beginning on May 4, through May 8, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2015-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR172 (Same As) 2015-05-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2697; text as passed Senate: CR S2693)
HR713 (Related) 2016-04-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HR702 (Related) 2016-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HR713 (Related) 2016-04-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HR702 (Related) 2016-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Economic performance and conditions
Small business
Small Business Administration
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Congressional tributes
Economic performance and conditions
Small business
Small Business Administration
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/246/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres246/BILLS-114hres246ih.pdf |