US HR233 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that Iran should immediately release the three United States citizens that it holds, as well as provide all known information on any United States citizens that have disappeared within its borders. Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that Iran should release all detained U.S. citizens and provide any information it possesses regarding any U.S. citizens who have disappeared within its borders.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that Iran should immediately release the three United States citizens that it holds, as well as provide all known information on any United States citizens that have disappeared within its borders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree (Y: 391 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-06-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 0 (Roll no. 364). (text: CR H4353) |
2015-06-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4361) |
2015-06-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 233. |
2015-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4353-4357) |
2015-06-15 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2015-06-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-06-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-26 | House | Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa Discharged. |
2015-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa. |
2015-05-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2964-2965) |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Iran
Middle East