US HR189 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 102-53)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the importance of sustained United States leadership to accelerating global progress against maternal and child malnutrition and supporting United States Agency for International Development's commitment to global nutrition through its multi-sectoral nutrition strategy. This resolution expresses support for increased U.S. efforts to combat malnutrition among women and children and acknowledges the contributions of the U.S. Agency for International Development in addressing global nutritional needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the importance of sustained United States leadership to accelerating global progress against maternal and child malnutrition and supporting United States Agency for International Development's commitment to global nutrition through its multi-sectoral nutrition strategy.

Sponsors

Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL]
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2020-03-10HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-10HouseSubcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Discharged.
2019-10-30HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-10-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR260 (Related) 2020-01-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S198-199)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback