US HR183 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 13, 2015, through April 17, 2015, as National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Awareness Week. Expresses support for the designation of National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Awareness Week. Recognizes that such personnel implement evidence-based practices to improve student outcomes. Commends the National Alliance of Specialized Instructional Support Personnel for its efforts to promote and improve the availability of specialized instructional support services. Encourages: (1) policymakers to work together to raise awareness of the importance of such personnel in education reform efforts, and (2) experts to share best practices. Urges: (1) the Department of Education to provide states and local educational agencies with guidance on effectively using such personnel to improve schools; and (2) the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration to promote the involvement of such personnel in efforts to improve mental health, reduce drug use, and improve overall community safety.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 13, 2015, through April 17, 2015, as National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR691 (Related) 2016-04-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Mental health
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Educational guidance
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Health personnel
Mental health
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/183/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres183/BILLS-114hres183ih.pdf |